What is 34 x 97?

4 Answers | Add Yours

gsenviro's profile pic

gsenviro | College Teacher | (Level 1) Educator Emeritus

Posted on

34 x 97 = 3298

It can be calculated in a number of ways.

either it can be calculated directly by multiplying the numbers.

or by a small simplification:

34 x 97 = 34 x (100-3) = 34 x 100 - 34 x 3 = 3400 - 210 = 3298

chandrachaks's profile pic

chandrachaks | Elementary School Teacher | (Level 1) Adjunct Educator

Posted on

We are given to calculate 34X97.

IT CAN BE CALCULATED EASILY BY FOLLOWING THE BELOW MENTIONED METHOD.

34 X 97 can also be written as

34 X (100 - 3)

(34 X 100) - (34 X 3)

3400 - 102

= 3298.

rsarvar1a's profile pic

rsarvar1a | Student, Grade 9 | (Level 1) Honors

Posted on

There are 2 different ways to solve 34 * 97.

First, we could just directly multiply the numbers (using a calculator, perhaps) to get the answer of 3298.

The other way is to simplify the multiplication:

34 * 97 = (30 * 97) + (4 * 97)

(30 * 97) + (4 * 97) = [(30 * 90) + (30 * 7)] + [(4 * 90) + (4 * 7)]

Now, we can create an equation that basically says 34 * 97 = x.

I used x to represent the unknown product:

[(30 * 90) + (30 * 7)] + [(4 * 90) + (4 * 7)] = x

I then solved each of the first bracket pairs, which are ( ).

[(30 * 90) + (30 * 7)] + [(4 * 90) + (4 * 7)] = x

[(2700) + (210)] + [(360) + (28)] = x

We then can solve for each of the second bracket pairs, which are [ ].

[(2700) + (210)] + [(360) + (28)] = x

[2910] + [388] = x

Now, I can add the two numbers on the left side to get x, which is the product:

[2910] + [388] = x

3298 = x

Therefore, the product of 34 * 97 is 3298.

brokenarsenal's profile pic

brokenarsenal | (Level 2) eNoter

Posted on

Q:What is 34x97

You can simplify it by doing: 

30:

10 * 97 = 970 + 970 + 970 = 2910

4:

2*97 = 194 +194 =388

388 + 2910 = 3,298

A: 3,298

We’ve answered 318,991 questions. We can answer yours, too.

Ask a question