`(20+25xx45)xx15(12-4)=?`

5 Answers | Add Yours

lemjay's profile pic

lemjay | High School Teacher | (Level 3) Senior Educator

Posted on

`(20+25xx45)xx15(12-4)`

To compute this, follow the order of operation known as PEMDAS.

So, simplify the expression inside each parenthesis.

For the first parenthesis, since there are two operations inside it,  apply order of operation too. So, multiply the two numbers 25 and 45.

`20+25xx45`

`=20+1125`

Then, add.

`=1145`

Hence, the expression inside the first parenthesis simplifies to:

`20+25xx45= 1145`

For the second parenthesis, since there is only one operation inside it, proceed to subtract the two numbers.

Hence, `12-4=8` .

Now that the expression inside each parenthesis are simplified, the whole expression becomes:

`(20+25xx45)xx15(12-4)`

`= 1145 xx15xx8`

Since only one operations remains, multiply the three numbers.

`=137400`

Therefore, `(20+25xx45)xx15(12-4)=137400` .

zumba96's profile pic

zumba96 | Student, Grade 11 | (Level 3) Valedictorian

Posted on

This problem requires using the order of operations PEMDAS

So first you would multiply 25 x 45 on one side and take away 4 from 12 on the other side,

You would be able to get 

(20 + 1125) x 15(8), multiply 15 x 8

(20 + 1125) x 120 

The simplify the problem and you would get a final answer of 137400

sid-sarfraz's profile pic

sid-sarfraz | Student, Graduate | (Level 2) Salutatorian

Posted on

` `

` `

QUESTION:-

`(20+25*45)*15(12-4)=?`

SOLUTION:-

Now to solve this we will follow the order of operations PEMDAS/BODMAS.

Hence the first step will be to solve brackets;

  • First multiplication
  • Then Division
  • Then Addition
  • Then Subtraction

(20 +25 x 45) x 15 ( 12 - 4 )

= (20 + 1125) x 15 (8)

= (20 + 1125) x 120

= 1145 x 120

= 137400

Hence the answer is 137400

malkaam's profile pic

malkaam | Student, Undergraduate | (Level 1) Valedictorian

Posted on

( 20 + 25 x 45 ) * 15 ( 12 - 4 ) = ?

To solve this we need to follow the order of operations i.e. PEMDAS / BODMAS, first step is to solve within the brackets, first multiplication then addition then subtraction,

(20 + 1125) * 15 (8)

1145 * 120

137400 Answer.

michuraisin's profile pic

michuraisin | Student, College Junior | (Level 1) Salutatorian

Posted on

Always remember the order of operations!

1) Parenthesis, 2) exponents, 3) multiply or divide, 4) add or subtract.

(20+25x45) x 15(12-4)=?

Do everything in parenthesis first. Since there's both multiplication and addition in the first parenthesis, multiply and then add.

(20+1125) x 15(8)=?

(1145) x 15(8)=?

1145 x 120=?

1145 x 120=137,400

We’ve answered 318,983 questions. We can answer yours, too.

Ask a question