Homework Help

What is `2+3+3+(32356*234)/565454+4556+(654*1233)/6765.67`

user profile pic

deathbeast354 | Student | (Level 1) eNoter

Posted November 20, 2012 at 5:50 PM via web

dislike 1 like

What is `2+3+3+(32356*234)/565454+4556+(654*1233)/6765.67`

2 Answers | Add Yours

user profile pic

justaguide | College Teacher | (Level 2) Distinguished Educator

Posted November 21, 2012 at 2:16 PM (Answer #1)

dislike 1 like

The required value of `2+3+3+(32356*234)/565454+4556+(654*1233)/6765.67` can be determined quite easily using a calculator, the multiplication and division would be a little difficult to perform manually.

The result is approximately 4696.57708770222

user profile pic

nickigonzalez123 | Student, Grade 9 | (Level 1) eNoter

Posted November 20, 2012 at 6:16 PM (Answer #2)

dislike 0 like

951.9299167 i think

Join to answer this question

Join a community of thousands of dedicated teachers and students.

Join eNotes